Al-Hejazi, Ayman Yahya Ali (CPSO#: 83172)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 18 Jul 2005 to 29 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2005 to 29 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2006 to 29 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2007 to 07 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Aug 2008