Al-Hindawi, Asaad Adil Ibrahim (CPSO#: 98534)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McNeely Medical Clinic
455 Mcneely Avenue
Carleton Place ON  K7C 4S6
Phone: (613) 253-2233
Fax: (613) 253-4595
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Algonquin College Health Services
1385 Woodroffe Ave, Room C141
Ottawa ON  K2G 1V8
Canada
Phone: 613-727-4723 Ext. 7222
Fax: 613-727-3166
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asaad Al-Hindawi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Hindawi ( CPSO# 98534 )

Business Address:
McNeely Medical Clinic
455 Mcneely Avenue
Carleton Place ON  K7C 4S6
Phone Number: (613) 253-2233

Business Address:
1385 Woodroffe Avenue
Suite C141
Ottawa ON  K2G 1V8
Phone Number: (613) 727-4723

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Aug 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASAAD ADIL IBRAHIM AL-HINDAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HINDAWI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014