Al-Homaidhi, Abdulaziz Mohammed Ebraheem (CPSO#: 64451)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1997