Al-Homayeed, Badr Adbulrahman Homayeed (CPSO#: 85917)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Jan 2007 to 28 Feb 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010