Al-Husain, Muneera Abdullah Saad (CPSO#: 87784)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2008 to 01 Dec 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 02 Dec 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009