AlHussain, Hussain Abdullah S (CPSO#: 85768)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PEAP - Resident - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013