Al-Jadaan, Saud Abdulkareem Mohamad (CPSO#: 68648)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 6 - Paediatric Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 7 - Paediatric Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 7 - Paediatric Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997