Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Al-Jahdali, Hamdan Hameed (CPSO#: 61880)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jan 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1993