Al-Jalfan, Ali Nasser Ali (CPSO#: 69600)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 15 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005