Al-Jeffri, Abdulla Hussain Eidrous (CPSO#: 67550)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Hematology
and Oncology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997