Al-Jubab, Abdulwahab Sulaiman Abed (CPSO#: 72947)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 30 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 22 Sep 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1998 to 22 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jan 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2001