Al-Judaibi, Bandar Mohammed H (CPSO#: 82369)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 15 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Judaibi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 5 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: University Hospital Room A10-225, Box 5339 339 Windermere Road London ON N4A 5A5
Date Received: 03 Oct 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2005 to 17 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hepatology/Liver Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hepatology/Liver Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2016