AlJurayyan, Abdulaziz Nasser A (CPSO#: 107647)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 2015 to 14 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2017