Al-Kaabi, Atheer (CPSO#: 87949)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Jan 2008 to 27 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Aug 2011