AlKawai, Fouad Ali Hassan (CPSO#: 92279)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 23 Jan 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010