Al-Kendi, Jalila Said Salim (CPSO#: 110378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 02 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Hematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JALILA SAID SALIM AL-KENDI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL-KENDI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL-KENDI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-KENDI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-KENDI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. AL-KENDI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. AL-KENDI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018