Al-Kerithy, Mohammed Faleh D (CPSO#: 69599)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999