Al-Khaledi, Dua'a Abdullah J F (CPSO#: 71007)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 26 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 27 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 26 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 27 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000