AlKhamees, Nasser Hamad A (CPSO#: 102847)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016