Al-Kharusi, Lamya Ahmed Ali (CPSO#: 75503)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Jul 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 18 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 19 Jul 2001 to 18 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 19 Jul 2002 to 18 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 19 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009