Al-Khattabi, Fadiah Salman Suliman (CPSO#: 92129)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 23 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2015 to 10 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Nov 2015