Al-Khayarin, Mohammed Mubarak A (CPSO#: 64854)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1996