Al-Kudmani, Basheer Subhi B (CPSO#: 85953)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 20 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2007 to 02 Mar 2007
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016