Al-Maghaslah, Khalid Ali Abdullah (CPSO#: 76922)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2004