Al-Maghrabi, Jaudah Ahmed Jaudah (CPSO#: 68623)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 02 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 18 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 18 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 18 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2001