Al-Maghrabi, Mohammed Bashir (CPSO#: 61632)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993