Al-Maghraby, Hatim Qasim Ibrahim (CPSO#: 78974)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2003 to 10 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 11 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2010