AlMahmoud, Munira Ali Mahamed Mahmoud (CPSO#: 78555)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Mahmoud, Munira Ali Mohamed (used until: 04 Jun 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 16 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008