Al-Mahmudi, Maha A (CPSO#: 81728)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 29 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 03 Aug 2004 to 26 Oct 2004
PEAP - Resident - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 27 Oct 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011