Al-Majali, Ansam Ratib Faiq (CPSO#: 88001)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Jordan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Jan 2008 to 07 Apr 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Apr 2008 to 07 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Jan 2009 to 07 Jan 2010
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2010