Al-Maktoum, Mariam Ali Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 70730)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000