Al-Mehrezi, Abdulla M S A Saleh (CPSO#: 85438)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010