AlMeqhaseeb, Ebtissam Saleh Abdullah (CPSO#: 97346)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2012 to 24 Apr 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 25 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014