Al-Mezeiny, Tawfiq A M (CPSO#: 73797)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 21 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2005