Al-Mowllad, Hala Saad Saeed (CPSO#: 87834)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Urogynaecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urogynaecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011