Al-Mukhaizeem, Fahad (CPSO#: 69483)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jul 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 04 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002