Al-Mulhim, Mobarak Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 69497)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000