Al-Mulhim, Saad Ibrahim (CPSO#: 68325)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 03 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 15 May 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999