Al-Mulla, Abdullah Hussain Ali (CPSO#: 70319)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001