Al-Murayeh, Mushabab Ayedh Mushabab (CPSO#: 69572)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999