AlMusawi, Ali S M A (CPSO#: 87838)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 05 Nov 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
Elective Trainee - Respirology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 03 Oct 2012
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2012