Al-Mutair, Abdulaziz S A O (CPSO#: 78345)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 21 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Jul 2003 to 21 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Jul 2004 to 21 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Jul 2005 to 21 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Jul 2006 to 21 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jul 2009