Al-Mutairi, Hasan Rashed Mohammed Ali Qebyan (CPSO#: 70668)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Urology Effective: 24 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 09 Oct 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Elective Trainee - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000