Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Al-Mutairy, Khaled Maheel S (CPSO#: 69601)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 15 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 16 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2002