Al-Nabhani, Dana Ahmed Mohamed (CPSO#: 79500)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2009