Al-Nammi, Ahmed Mohammad Ibrahim (CPSO#: 68563)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 22 Sep 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000