Al-Nazer, Ghada Ali Mohammed (CPSO#: 78790)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2003 to 07 Mar 2003
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2004