Al-Nemri, Khalid Jaber Mahmoud (CPSO#: 70743)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 29 Jul 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 29 Jul 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Nov 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2001