Al-Nesf, Mariam Ali Yousuf (CPSO#: 79350)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 16 Jun 2003 to 21 Jul 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005