Al-Nowaiser, Owayed Humod (CPSO#: 50070)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994